E | 05/19/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/09/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3710 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1663 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1656 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3309 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1222 | Journal Page: 3308 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3308 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 712 | Journal Page: 3191 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/22/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 846 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 517 | |
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 476 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 12/08/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |