Senate | 03/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 233 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 169 | |
Senate | 12/08/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/08/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |