E
|
06/09/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3236
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6360
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2253
|
Journal Page: 6359
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6359
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 2472
|
Journal Page: 6358
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6425
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3232
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 711
|
Journal Page: 3232
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3170
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5090
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4991
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2379
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2378
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2011
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4395
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1754
|
Journal Page: 4395
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4395
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4395
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1742
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4352
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Amended
|
3-Ramos
|
Journal Page: 4351
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Amended 3-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4350
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4220
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amended
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 4350
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Perry
|
Journal Page: 728
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 728
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 703
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 682
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 635
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 579
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 395
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 326
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|