E | 05/24/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4047 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1784 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Record vote | RV#1217 | Journal Page: 3304 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3304 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Amended | 1-Klick | Journal Page: 3304 |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3304 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3169 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3169 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 920 | Journal Page: 3169 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1389 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 849 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 734 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 395 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 171 | |
Senate | 12/16/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/16/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |