E
|
06/16/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2760
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5176
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5184
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2039
|
Journal Page: 5184
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5184
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5184
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5172
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5172
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 983
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 708
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 336
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1387
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 173
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|