E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
E
|
05/29/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3307
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6486
|
Senate
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3197
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3063
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5616
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2848
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2847
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2247
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1845
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4642
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4625
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4625
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1184
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1121
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1121
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1121
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2461
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 173
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|