Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 176 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 12/29/2022 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/29/2022 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |