LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB347
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB347
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB347
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/15/2023
8:30 am
Transportation Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.016
SB190
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB247
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB261
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB323
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB347
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB507
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB508
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB656
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB904
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB1021
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
SB1023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately