Senate | 04/04/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 765 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 540 | |
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 474 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 177 | |
Senate | 01/05/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/05/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |