Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 6, 2023
Bill January 5, 2023
Bill January 5, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 6, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 8, 2023