House
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4227
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amended
|
FA3 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amended FA3 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA7 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA7 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA6 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA5 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA4 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Campbell
|
Journal Page: 1681
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1083
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 4044
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 178
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|