E | 05/23/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/23/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2543 | |
E | 05/11/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1817 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4045 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1751 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3610 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1375 | Journal Page: 3609 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3609 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3609 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3394 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1269 | Journal Page: 3394 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3394 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3394 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 3544 | Journal Page: 3394 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 922 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 633 |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 633 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 179 | |
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |