Senate | 04/24/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1235 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1005 | |
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 180 | |
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |