House | 05/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3343 | |
House | 05/06/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3343 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2913 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1543 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Paxton | Journal Page: 1523 |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1523 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1522 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1541 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1448 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1236 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3343 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 183 | |
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |