Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB422 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 422


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain military service members to
 engage in a business or occupation in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 55.004(d), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  A state agency that issues a license that has a
 residency requirement for license eligibility shall adopt rules
 regarding documentation necessary for an applicant who is a
 military service member or military spouse [applicant] to establish
 residency for purposes of this subsection, including by providing
 to the agency a copy of the permanent change of station order for
 the applicant or the applicant's spouse [military service member to
 whom the spouse is married].
 SECTION 2.  Section 55.0041, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 55.0041.  RECOGNITION OF OUT-OF-STATE LICENSE OF
 MILITARY SERVICE MEMBERS AND MILITARY SPOUSES [SPOUSE]. (a)
 Notwithstanding any other law, a military service member or
 military spouse may engage in a business or occupation for which a
 license is required without obtaining the applicable license if the
 member or spouse is currently licensed in good standing by another
 jurisdiction that has licensing requirements that are
 substantially equivalent to the requirements for the license in
 this state.
 (b)  Before engaging in the practice of the business or
 occupation, the military service member or military spouse must:
 (1)  notify the applicable state agency of the member's
 or spouse's intent to practice in this state;
 (2)  submit to the agency proof of the member's or
 spouse's residency in this state in accordance with rules adopted
 under Section 55.004(d) and a copy of the member's or spouse's
 military identification card; and
 (3)  receive from the agency confirmation that:
 (A)  the agency has verified the member's or
 spouse's license in the other jurisdiction; and
 (B)  the member or spouse is authorized to engage
 in the business or occupation in accordance with this section.
 (c)  The military service member or military spouse shall
 comply with all other laws and regulations applicable to the
 business or occupation in this state.
 (d)  A military service member or military spouse may engage
 in the business or occupation under the authority of this section
 only for the period during which the military service member or,
 with respect to a military spouse, the military service member to
 whom the [military] spouse is married is stationed at a military
 installation in this state but not to exceed three years from the
 date the member or spouse receives the confirmation described by
 Subsection (b)(3).
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d), in the event of a
 divorce or similar event that affects a person's status as a
 military spouse, the spouse may continue to engage in the business
 or occupation under the authority of this section until the third
 anniversary of the date the spouse received the confirmation
 described by Subsection (b)(3).
 (e)  A state agency that issues a license shall adopt rules
 to implement this section. The rules must establish a process for
 the agency to:
 (1)  identify, with respect to each type of license
 issued by the agency, the jurisdictions that have licensing
 requirements that are substantially equivalent to the requirements
 for the license in this state; and
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after the date a
 military service member or military spouse submits the information
 described by Subsections (b)(1) and (2), verify that the member or
 [a military] spouse is licensed in good standing in a jurisdiction
 described by Subdivision (1).
 (f)  In addition to the rules adopted under Subsection (e), a
 state agency that issues a license may adopt rules to provide for
 the issuance of a license to a military service member or military
 spouse to whom the agency provides confirmation under Subsection
 (b)(3). A license issued under this subsection must expire not
 later than the third anniversary of the date the agency provided the
 confirmation and may not be renewed. A state agency may not charge
 a fee for the issuance of the license.
 SECTION 3.  Section 55.005(a), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A state agency that issues a license shall, not later
 than the 30th day [as soon as practicable] after the date a military
 service member, military veteran, or military spouse files an
 application for a license:
 (1)  process the application; and
 (2)  issue the license to an applicant who qualifies
 for the license under Section 55.004.
 SECTION 4.  Section 55.005(a), Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to an application for a license submitted
 on or after the effective date of this Act.  An application
 submitted before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than December 1, 2023, a state agency
 to which Section 55.0041, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies shall adopt rules to implement that section.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 422 passed the Senate on
 April 13, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 422 passed the House on
 May 24, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 3,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor