House | 04/17/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1528 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1282 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 791 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 791 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 791 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Paxton | Journal Page: 790 |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1528 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 184 | |
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |