Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 03/29/2023 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor