Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 14, 2023
Bill January 13, 2023
Bill January 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis June 20, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 15, 2023