Senate | 04/26/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Reported from s/c with no recommendation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Considered by subcommittee | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |