Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB464 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 28, 2023
Bill January 13, 2023
Bill January 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 30, 2023

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 27, 2023