Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB478 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 21, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 9, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 12, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 12, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023