Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB48 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 27, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 2, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill March 27, 2023