Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 24, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 1, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 22, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2023
Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023