Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 9, 2023
Bill January 18, 2023
Bill January 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill May 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note April 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 25, 2023