E | 06/18/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/18/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3309 | |
E | 05/25/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2989 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5615 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2712 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2429 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4872 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Record vote | RV#1935 | Journal Page: 4871 |
House | 05/22/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 4871 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4871 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4676 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4676 | |
House | 05/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4564 | |
House | 04/27/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
House | 03/29/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 650 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 650 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 650 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 650 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 582 | |
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1300 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 197 | |
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |