Senate | 04/12/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 892 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 198 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 198 | |
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |