Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 20, 2023