Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 20, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 3, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 29, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 29, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023