Senate | 03/23/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 616 | |
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 380 | |
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |