Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB558 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 27, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 25, 2023