House | 05/23/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 424 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 422 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 412 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 393 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Menndez | Journal Page: 393 |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 393 | |
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 297 | |
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 982 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |