Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB560 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 1, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill May 17, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 16, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023