Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB569 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 14, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 4, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 16, 2023