E
|
05/24/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
E
|
05/12/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1859
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4216
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1817
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3245
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3265
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 618
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 592
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Motion to appeal ruling
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 591
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 981
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 149
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2022
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|