Last Action: 05/15/2023 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective immediately
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar