Senate | 05/02/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1488 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |