Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB59 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 1, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Analysis May 24, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023
Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 24, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis March 1, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023