E | 05/19/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/19/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2243 | |
E | 05/08/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1657 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3466 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2927 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#998 | Journal Page: 2926 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2926 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2926 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2871 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1517 | Journal Page: 2871 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2791 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1635 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1042 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1024 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 506 | |
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |