Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB593 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/01/2023

                    By: Sparks, et al. S.B. No. 593
 (Frank, Rose, Noble, Garcia, et al.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an independent assessment of the Health and Human
 Services Commission's and the Department of Family and Protective
 Services' rules, minimum standards, and contract requirements that
 apply to certain residential child-care providers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 42, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 42.027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.027.  INDEPENDENT ASSESSMENT. (a) Not later than
 March 31, 2024, the commission shall contract with an independent
 entity that has demonstrated expertise in evaluating state child
 welfare systems and conducting statistical and operational
 analysis to conduct an assessment of:
 (1)  the commission's and the department's rules,
 minimum standards, and contract requirements that apply to
 child-placing agencies, residential child-care facilities
 including foster homes, relative caregivers, and adoptive homes;
 and
 (2)  the standards or oversight requirements
 prescribed by law to determine:
 (A)  the relevance of the standard or oversight
 requirement;
 (B)  whether the standard or oversight
 requirement complies with federal laws, rules, or guidelines; and
 (C)  whether the standard or oversight
 requirement is the best practice.
 (b)  Not later than September 30, 2024, or the date of the
 next comprehensive review required under Section 42.042(b),
 whichever occurs first, the independent entity shall complete the
 assessment and submit to the commission and the department a report
 that includes the findings of the assessment and recommendations
 for:
 (1)  simplifying the commission's minimum standards for
 the purposes of:
 (A)  prioritizing the health, safety, and
 well-being of children residing in a residential child-care
 facility including a foster home or the home of a relative caregiver
 or an adoptive parent; and
 (B)  reducing any barriers to opening a
 child-placing agency or a residential child-care facility or
 becoming a relative caregiver, a foster parent, or an adoptive
 parent;
 (2)  adjusting the commission's system for assigning
 weights to minimum standards to ensure that the system is
 methodical, consistent, and reflective of a strategic model for
 increasing the focus on the health, safety, and well-being of
 children residing in a residential child-care facility including a
 foster home or the home of a relative caregiver or an adoptive
 parent, including an explanation of the recommended adjustments;
 (3)  taking into consideration the model licensing
 standards recommended by the Administration for Children and
 Families of the United States Department of Health and Human
 Services, eliminating any minimum standards that are weighted as
 low, medium-low, or medium by the commission and are not directly
 related to child safety;
 (4)  addressing any licensing, training, or oversight
 requirements that are barriers to retaining high-quality
 residential child-care facilities including foster homes, relative
 caregivers, or adoptive parents;
 (5)  updating licensing standards for the purposes of:
 (A)  prioritizing the health, safety, and
 well-being of children residing in a residential child-care
 facility including a foster home or the home of a relative caregiver
 or an adoptive parent; and
 (B)  reducing any barriers to the hiring and
 retention of high-quality leadership, administrators, and staff at
 child-placing agencies and residential child-care facilities;
 (6)  providing maximum flexibility in applying
 standards to ensure that services are provided in response to the
 needs of each individual child residing in a residential child-care
 facility including a foster home or the home of a relative caregiver
 or an adoptive parent;
 (7)  defining the commission's and the department's
 role in licensing, investigating, contract oversight, and any other
 regulatory activity to eliminate duplicate functions among the
 commission and the department or divisions within the commission or
 department; and
 (8)  promoting transparency and clarity of the
 commission's and the department's expectations for child-placing
 agencies, residential child-care facilities including foster
 homes, relative caregivers, and adoptive parents.
 (c)  The independent entity conducting the assessment under
 this section shall make any recommendations for legislative action,
 including recommendations for retaining, repealing, or modifying
 existing state laws or rules or adopting new state laws or rules,
 necessary to implement the entity's recommendations described by
 Subsection (b).
 (d)  In conducting the assessment, the independent entity
 shall solicit and consider the input of relevant stakeholders,
 including those affected by the commission's or the department's
 rules, minimum standards, and contract requirements that apply to
 child-placing agencies, residential child-care facilities
 including foster homes, relative caregivers, or adoptive parents.
 (e)  The commission shall publish the independent entity's
 report on the commission's Internet website and submit a copy of the
 report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the standing committee of each house
 of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over the commission.
 (f)  Not later than the 90th day after the date the
 commission receives the independent entity's report, the
 commission, in collaboration with the department, shall submit to
 the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, and the standing committee of each house of the
 legislature with primary jurisdiction over the commission a report
 that includes a description of:
 (1)  the commission's and department's plan to
 implement the independent entity's assessment recommendations; and
 (2)  any recommendation the commission or department
 decides not to implement and a written justification for not
 implementing the recommendation.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.