Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB594 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2023

                    By: Zaffirini, LaMantia S.B. No. 594
 (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2023; February 17, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
 Rural Affairs; April 4, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 4, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 594 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for and charges for service from public
 drinking water supply systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 341.0315, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (c)  Each public drinking water supply system shall provide
 an adequate and safe drinking water supply. The supply must:
 (1)  meet the requirements of Section 341.031 and
 commission rules; and
 (2)  provide a quantity of water or capacity of water
 sufficient to serve the number of connections served by the public
 drinking water supply system, unless the water system is a
 noncommunity nontransient water system.
 (c-1)  Notwithstanding any other law, the commission by rule
 shall establish connection equivalency values for each meter size
 used to serve a recreational vehicle park, as defined by Section
 13.087, Water Code, for use in determining the number of
 connections served by a public drinking water supply system that
 provides service through meters. When determining the number of
 connections, the commission may only consider service for which a
 meter has been installed that conforms with industry standards.
 The rules must:
 (1)  establish that eight recreational vehicle or cabin
 sites at a recreational vehicle park, whether occupied or not, are
 equivalent to one residential metered connection; and
 (2)  provide a variance from a connection equivalency
 value established under this subsection for a public drinking water
 supply system if actual system usage is more than 10 percent below
 the equivalency value.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 13, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 13.152 to read as follows:
 Sec. 13.152.  BILLING FOR RECREATIONAL VEHICLE PARKS. (a)
 In this section, "recreational vehicle park" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 13.087.
 (b)  A retail public utility, other than a municipally owned
 utility described by Section 13.087, providing water or sewer
 service to a recreational vehicle park:
 (1)  shall ensure that billing for the service is based
 on actual water usage recorded by the retail public utility; and
 (2)  may not impose a surcharge based on the number of
 recreational vehicle or cabin sites in the recreational vehicle
 park.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *