House | 04/14/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1391 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 929 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 886 | |
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 769 | |
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 394 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |