E | 05/24/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/24/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2684 | |
E | 05/12/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1859 | |
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4216 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1833 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1758 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3723 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1411 | Journal Page: 3722 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3722 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3722 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3674 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1401 | Journal Page: 3673 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 884 | Journal Page: 3673 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3713 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
House | 04/06/2023 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1282 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Amended | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Flores | Journal Page: 792 |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 685 | |
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 422 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1387 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |