Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB61 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2023

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 61
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2022; February 15, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 March 14, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 16, Nays 0; March 14, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 61 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the methods by which the comptroller may provide
 certain notices relating to the revocation or suspension of a
 permit or license or the forfeiture of corporate privileges in this
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.0047, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read
 as follows:
 (d)  Notices under this section may be served on the holder
 of the permit or license personally, [or] may be mailed to the
 holder's address as shown in the records of the comptroller, or at
 the election of the holder of the permit or license, may be served
 by electronic means.
 (e)  Service by electronic means is complete when the
 comptroller transmits the notice using the contact information
 provided to the comptroller by the holder of the permit or license
 as shown in the records of the comptroller.
 (f)  Service by mail is complete when the notice is deposited
 by the comptroller in a United States Postal Service post office.
 SECTION 2.  Section 151.203, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read
 as follows:
 (d)  Notices under this section may be served on the permit
 holder personally, [or] may be mailed to the permittee's address as
 shown in the records of the comptroller, or at the election of the
 holder of the permit, may be served by electronic means.
 (e)  Service by electronic means is complete when the
 comptroller transmits the notice using the contact information
 provided to the comptroller by the permit holder as shown in the
 records of the comptroller.
 (f)  Service by mail is complete when the notice is deposited
 by the comptroller in a United States Postal Service post office.
 SECTION 3.  Section 171.251, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 171.251.  FORFEITURE OF CORPORATE PRIVILEGES. The
 comptroller shall forfeit the corporate privileges of a corporation
 on which the franchise tax is imposed if the corporation:
 (1)  does not file, in accordance with this chapter and
 within 45 days after the date notice of forfeiture is mailed or at
 the election of the corporation, provided by electronic means, a
 report required by this chapter;
 (2)  does not pay, within 45 days after the date notice
 of forfeiture is mailed or at the election of the corporation,
 provided by electronic means, a tax imposed by this chapter or does
 not pay, within those 45 days, a penalty imposed by this chapter
 relating to that tax; or
 (3)  does not permit the comptroller to examine under
 Section 171.211 [of this code] the corporation's records.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 171.256(c) and (d), Tax Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The comptroller shall mail the notice or at the election
 of the corporation, send the notice by electronic means, to the
 corporation at least 45 days before the forfeiture of corporate
 privileges. The notice shall be:
 (1)  addressed to the corporation and mailed to the
 address named in the corporation's charter as its principal place
 of business or to another known place of business of the corporation
 if the notice is mailed to the corporation; or
 (2)  sent to the corporation by electronic means using
 the contact information provided to the comptroller by the
 corporation as shown in the records of the comptroller if the notice
 is sent to the corporation by electronic means.
 (d)  The comptroller shall keep at the comptroller's office a
 record of the date on which the notice is mailed or sent by
 electronic means. For the purposes of this chapter, the notice and
 the record of the [mailing] date the notice was mailed or sent by
 electronic means constitute legal and sufficient notice of the
 forfeiture.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *