Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB61 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 9, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 20, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Bill May 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 20, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 14, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023