Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 27, 2023
Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 8, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis February 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023