Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB621 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis March 3, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 16, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note May 1, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 5, 2023