Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB622 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 6, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2023
Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023