Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB627 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis April 3, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Analysis May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis June 29, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 29, 2023
Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill April 17, 2023