Senate | 02/17/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 136 | |
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 126 | |
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |