Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB656 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 21, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill May 4, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 15, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Analysis May 25, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023
Bill May 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 25, 2023
Analysis May 4, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 23, 2023
Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 12, 2023